Financial history ALRESFORD WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 298831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.31k £1.59k £6.68k £4.91k £10.73k
Total expenditure £2.29k £1.62k £5.96k £4.17k £10.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A