ALRESFORD WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Womens Institute. A monthly meeting for women with speakers arts and crafts competitions outings and area meetings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 08 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Leighton | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hughes | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Herbert | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Barker | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pat Katharine Seal | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Anne Luxon | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine May James | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Salmon | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Hilda Louise Newbold | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31k | £1.59k | £6.68k | £4.91k | £10.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.29k | £1.62k | £5.96k | £4.17k | £10.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
ALRESFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
184 Wivenhoe Road
Alresford
COLCHESTER
CO7 8AH
- Phone:
- 01206 827256
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window