Trustees ALRESFORD WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 298831

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elizabeth Leighton | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hughes | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Herbert | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Barker | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pat Katharine Seal | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Anne Luxon | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine May James | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Salmon | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Hilda Louise Newbold | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.