Trustees THE SWINDON U3A

Charity number: 298853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vince Williams Chair 26 March 2024
None on record
Eric George Hewitt Trustee 30 January 2024
None on record
Sharon Lee Finch Trustee 29 August 2023
None on record
Monica Jill King Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
David George Todd Trustee 14 November 2022
None on record
Linda Mary Young Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record