Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF NORTH WALSHAM WAR MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Charity number: 298857
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 March 2022 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required