BRAMSHOTT AND LIPHOOK PARISH VOLUNTARY CARE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage within the Parish of Bramshott and Liphook and surrounding areas by the provision of transport to and from medical appointments. Medical appointments are defined as visits to doctors, hospitals,dentists, opticians and similar health related establishments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 29 March 1988: Standard registration
- BRAMSHOTT AND LIPHOOK VOLUNTARY CARE (Working name)
- VOLUNTARY CARE (Working name)
- BRAMSHOTT AND LIPHOOK PARISH COMMUNITY CARE GROUP (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Sean Morris | Chair | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Bint | Trustee | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penny Anne Leigh | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE RAMAGE | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF GOLDSACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David John Lush | Trustee |
|
||||||
GERD GOLDSACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIGADIER NIGEL STILL CBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.64k | £5.60k | £5.61k | £10.02k | £11.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.36k | £6.90k | £5.71k | £9.87k | £10.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 26 FEBRUARY 2009. AS AMENDED ON 22 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE WITHIN THE PARISH OF BRAMSHOTT AND LIPHOOK AND SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT TO AND FROM MEDICAL APPOINTMENTS. MEDICAL APPOINTMENTS ARE DEFINED AS VISITS TO DOCTORS, HOSPITALS, DENTISTS, OPTICIANS AND SIMILAR HEALTH RELATED ESTABLISHMENTS.
Area of benefit
BRAMSHOTT AND LIPHOOK PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Eleanor Close
Passfield
LIPHOOK
Hampshire
GU30 7TX
- Phone:
- 07961521305
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window