PADDINGTON ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Paddington Arts is an arts and media centre for young people between the ages of 6 and 26.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £93,495 from 7 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 28 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN HAYLING | Chair | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE CHANG | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Sophie Morris-White | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
CHERYL DIANE JOSEPH | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tracy Weekes | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Geoffrey Lazarus | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Hamza Taouzzale | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
ANSEL WONG CBE | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
LEANDRA BOX | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ANGELA PIDDOCK | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|||||||
LIONEL MCCALMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ALISON STANLEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ICILDA BUCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ADELE BRAITHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.59k | £255.05k | £396.38k | £368.51k | £351.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.35k | £262.62k | £346.10k | £379.04k | £350.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £42.80k | £6.75k | £45.73k | £65.45k | £93.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THE FIELDS OF VIDEO AND OR DRAMA. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN THE FIELDS OF MUSIC, DRAMA, DANCE, FILM AND VIDEO PRODUCTION, AND OTHER ARTS AND MEDIA SKILLS. TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE BENEFICIARIES, PROVIDED THAT THOSE PERSONS HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE GLA
Contact information
- Address:
-
PADDINGTON ARTS
32 WOODFIELD ROAD
LONDON
W9 2BE
- Phone:
- 02072862722
- Email:
- info@paddingtonarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window