CALNE CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supply of material used by churches and individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 25 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RUTH RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY CHARLES BROOKMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM HENRY JARVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.55k | £13.66k | £20.61k | £24.77k | £23.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.50k | £18.48k | £17.59k | £21.19k | £27.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (FOR DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 3 OF TRUST DEED.)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Calne Christian Bookshop
16 Phelps Parade
CALNE
SN11 0HA
- Phone:
- 01249823265
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window