ORGANIZATION OF SHEPPEY NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH SCHEMES
Charity Number: 298907
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 18 March 1988: Standard registration
- 20 June 2000: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- ASSOCIATION OF SHEPPEY NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH SCHEMES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH JUNE 1987 AND AMENDED 16TH MARCH 1988 AS AMENDED 28TH NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE IN THE ISLE OF SHEPPEY AND SURROUNDING AREA AND TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ISLE OF SHEPPEY AND SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.