Financial history TOTTERDOWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 298912
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/10/2019 14/10/2020 14/10/2021 14/10/2022 14/10/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £495 £10.98k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £489 £3.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.40k