SEERAH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Mission is to transform communities and people's lives by: 1) Sharing the life and message of the Prophet Muhammad around in the world. 2) Providing accessible & authentic Islamic educational resources to everyone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 1988: Standard registration
- 23 January 2017: Funds received from 272043 THE MUSLIM SCHOOLS TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Syed Yasir Hassan | Chair | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Syed Yusuf Hassan | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rizwan Kayani | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhmood Usman Hamid | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ASMA SHARIFF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR IBRAHIM RAHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.85k | £47.76k | £88.48k | £84.18k | £73.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.29k | £52.39k | £113.11k | £112.01k | £78.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.53k | £21.19k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16TH DECEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND THE STUDY OF ISLAM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 GILLESPIE ROAD
LONDON
N5 1LN
- Phone:
- 07500660061
- Email:
- info@seerah.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window