ISLE OF WIGHT DIABETIC FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief and treatment of persons suffering from diabetes and any other disease which is co-existent with or related to diabetes. Promotion of public education and research into the nature, causes, prevention and treatment of diabetes. Promoting the health and welfare of persons suffering from diabetes. Promoting education in the nature, causes, prevention and treatment of diabetes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 05 April 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL ST JOHN JACOBS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachel Flood | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terence Willey | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Stanley | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY ELIZABETH PORTEOUS | Trustee | 29 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr VICTOR LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH WHITTINGSTALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.07k | £29.37k | £38.19k | £22.27k | £109.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.27k | £19.58k | £17.51k | £16.33k | £29.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST MARCH 1988 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 29 AUGUST 2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT OF 9 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DIABETES AND ANY OTHER DISEASE WHICH IS CO-EXISTENT WITH OR RELATED TO DIABETES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DIABETES AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; (C) PROMOTING THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DIABETES BY THE PURCHASE OF EQUPMENT OR BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL NURSING OR OTHER STAFF OR FACILITIES NECESSARY FOR THE TREATMENT OR RELIEF OF DIABETES: (D) PROMOTING EDUCATION IN, AND THE INCREASE OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE OF, THE NATURE, CAUSES, PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DIABETES BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FORM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISLE OF WIGHT DIABETIC FUND
THE ARUN BAKSI DIABETES CENTRE
ST MARYS HOSPITAL
NEWPORT
ISLE OF WIGHT
PO30 5TG
- Phone:
- 01983 534248
- Email:
- RACHEL.FLOOD@NHS.NET
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window