Financial history HIGH RODING AND GREAT CANFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 298940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.43k £2.15k £4.70k £3.94k £5.90k
Total expenditure £7.38k £4.83k £3.01k £11.22k £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A