THE 1 RHA TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The 1RHA Trust Fund promotes the efficiency of 1st Regiment Royal Horse Artillery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 March 1988: Standard registration
- FIRST TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dominic Ian | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col James Luck | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Gary Clapp | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Michael Webster | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.46k | £53.04k | £31.43k | £38.47k | £35.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.19k | £38.77k | £36.46k | £50.37k | £37.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4TH DECEMBER 1987.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF 1ST REGIMENT ROYAL HORSE ARTILLERY BY: (1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A TROPHY FOR THE USE BY AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL RANKS OF THE REGIMENT (2) THE PROVISION OF RELIEF EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO POOR MEMBERS AND THE POOR DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS AND DECEASED MEMBERS (3) MAKING GRANTS TO ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION WHOSE OBJECTS INCLUDE THE RELIEF OF POOR MEMBERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS (4) EFFECTING SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL OR ANY OF THE MEMBERS AND THE DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS AND DECEASED MEMBERS EITHER INDIVIDUALLY OR COLLECTIVELY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Secretary First Trust
1 RHA
Purvis Lines
Larkhill
Wilts
SP4 8QT
- Phone:
- 07884486905
- Email:
- 1RHA-RAO-RAO@mod.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window