THE WALKER LINES INDOOR SPORT AND RECREATION CENTRE GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide buildings and open space in Bodmin for sport & recreation for various clubs and other user groups from the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 28 March 1988: Standard registration
- 04 October 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 October 2013: Funds transferred to 1148616 THE WALKER LINES GYMNASIUM
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.12k | £3.53k | £24.97k | £8.90k | £14.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.02k | £1.88k | £4.25k | £2.76k | £5.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 20 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 30 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 09 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 02 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
BODMIN AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window