ST PAUL'S COMMUNITY CENTRE - MARYLEBONE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the physical, mental and spiritual well-being of the whole community of North Marylebone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 15 April 1988: Standard registration
- 29 July 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ST PAULS CENTRE (Previous name)
- ST PAUL'S COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.97k | £85.06k | £66.75k | £69.11k | £23.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.67k | £80.21k | £52.10k | £69.67k | £38.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 23 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 03 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 03 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 1987, 3 NOVEMBER 1993, 10 MAY 2010 AND 9 JUNE 2010.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE WELLBEING OF, AND IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR, THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH MARYLEBONE/PADDINGTON BY GIVING PASTORAL CARE, OPPORTUNITIES FOR SELF-DEVELOPMENT THROUGH LEARNING AND BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION. 3.2 THIS OBJECT IS TO BE CARRIED OUT WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES POLICY
Area of benefit
NORTH MARYLEBONE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window