Governing document ST PAUL'S COMMUNITY CENTRE - MARYLEBONE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 SEPTEMBER 1985 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 1987, 3 NOVEMBER 1993, 10 MAY 2010 AND 9 JUNE 2010.
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE THE WELLBEING OF, AND IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR, THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH MARYLEBONE/PADDINGTON BY GIVING PASTORAL CARE, OPPORTUNITIES FOR SELF-DEVELOPMENT THROUGH LEARNING AND BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION. 3.2 THIS OBJECT IS TO BE CARRIED OUT WITHOUT DISCRIMINATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES POLICY
Area of benefit
NORTH MARYLEBONE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.