LEWISHAM BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bereavement service for the multi-racial and multi-cultural community in the London borough of Lewisham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £42,005 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lewisham
Governance
- 15 April 1988: Standard registration
- 12 October 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 October 2020: Funds transferred to 210667 ST CHRISTOPHERS HOSPICE
- LBC (Working name)
- LEWISHAM BEREAVEMENT SERVICE (Working name)
- NORTH LEWISHAM COMMUNITY BEREAVEMENT SCHEME (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.56k | £38.51k | £55.43k | £43.90k | £44.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.61k | £52.21k | £64.77k | £51.54k | £54.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £52.51k | N/A | £42.01k | |
|
Income from government grants | £42.01k | £31.50k | N/A | £42.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 04 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 04 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 13 December 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH MARCH 1987 AS AMENDED 14TH DECEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN LEWISHAM, WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT.
Area of benefit
LEWISHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window