CBRE UK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust will consider requests for support from clients of CBRE Limited and requests for sponsorship from its staff (individually or in teams) who are personally involved in fundraising activities. The Trust will also consider requests for support for any other party with whom CBRE has a significant relationship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 1988: Standard registration
- C B HILLIER PARKER CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- C B RICHARD ELLIS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- CBRE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE HILLIER PARKER MAY AND ROWDEN CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY DARREN GREGORY | Chair | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Shaw | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajveer Bains | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharvani Hindocha | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard White | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aimee Parkinson | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.73k | £55.01k | £5 | £100.00k | £70.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.10k | £31.90k | £34.92k | £67.42k | £106.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 SEP 1987 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 1988 AS AMENDED ON 18 DEC 1998 AS AMENDED ON 30 OCT 2003 AS AMENDED ON 07 DEC 2005 AS AMENDED ON 01 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CBRE
Henrietta House
Henrietta Place
LONDON
W1G 0NB
- Phone:
- 02071823425
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window