Financial history ONE TO ONE PROJECT

Charity number: 299052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £131.67k £189.69k £191.59k £176.80k £216.37k
Total expenditure £139.92k £131.08k £138.83k £157.16k £158.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £81.00k £83.67k £167.34k N/A