RELATE CROYDON AND WIMBLEDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relationship Counselling for couples, individuals, families and young people Education and Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Merton
- Surrey
- Sutton
Governance
- 22 April 1988: Standard registration
- 12 May 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CROYDON MARRIAGE GUIDANCE COUNCIL (Previous name)
- CROYDON RELATE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £374.83k | £380.43k | £363.08k | £319.71k | £319.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.95k | £373.51k | £396.31k | £333.23k | £333.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | 22 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 21 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 27 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 21 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 14 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 19 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH FEBRUARY 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 30 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
4.(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE ARE: 4.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 4.2 TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 4.2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 4.2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 4.3 TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH: = 4.3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR 4.3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4.4 TO ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; 4.5 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.6 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS OF CROYDON, SUTTON AND MERTON AND TANDRIDGE IN SURREY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window