EDMONTON HUNDRED HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports Historical research, publications, lectures and information regarding the Edmonton Hundred area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Enfield
- Haringey
Governance
- 22 April 1988: Standard registration
- EHHS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr WALTER ROBERT HARE | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
REX BOURNE | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL MACDONALD | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBERT MUSGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.90k | £1.79k | £837 | £1.43k | £930 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.28k | £2.03k | £1.37k | £1.62k | £1.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 23RD MARCH 1988, AS AMENDED 22 MARCH 2000 as amended on 20 Mar 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCTION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE STUDY OF LOCAL HISTORY OF THE HUNDRED EDMONTON THAT IS THE ANCIENT PARISHES OF EDMONTON, ENFIELD, MONK HADLEY, SOOUTH MIMMS AND TOTTENHAM.
Area of benefit
ENFIELD LB HARINGEY LB
Contact information
- Address:
-
13A PALMERSTON ROAD
BOWES PARK
LONDON
N22 8QH
- Phone:
- 07341 212 813
- Email:
- INFO@EDMONTONHUNDRED.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window