WEST BERGHOLT CARE NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transporting village clients to and from various appoinments i.e. doctors, dentist & hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Essex
Governance
- 03 April 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARRY STONE | Chair | 27 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
Roxy Boyce-Bown | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
karen stephenson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET KERR | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mervyn Donnelly | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HEWITT | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE SHAIKLY | Trustee | 17 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.24k | £920 | £1.56k | £4.09k | £3.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.30k | £869 | £1.16k | £2.58k | £3.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 January 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/04/1987 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/1988 AS AMENDED ON 20/04/2010 as amended on 14 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
The objective for which Care is established is to undertake voluntary work and similar charitable activities amongst those people in the area of benefit who are in need thereof. In furtherance of the above object but not further or otherwise Care may: (i) Provide transport services with appropriate safeguarding for the relief of the elderly, handicapped or sick and for other persons in need. (ii) Assist when possible other voluntary or statutory organisations when needed and asked for, who are involved in similar charitable work in the area of benefit. (iii) In furtherance of the above objectives but not further or otherwise Care may: (a) Raise funds and invite and receive contributions from any person or persons whatsoever by way of donation and otherwise provided that Care shall not undertake any permanent trading activities. (b) Generally do all such lawful things as are necessary for the attainment of such purposes or any of them
Area of benefit
WEST BERGHOLT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD RECTORY
COOKS HALL ROAD
WEST BERGHOLT
COLCHESTER
CO6 3EX
- Phone:
- 01206241103
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window