THE COT DEATH SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 1988: Standard registration
- 24 May 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 24 May 2005: Funds transferred to 1092653 THE COT DEATH SOCIETY
- SOCIETY FOR THE PRESERVATION OF INFANT LIFE (Working name)
- SOCIETY FOR THE PRESEVATION OF INFANT LIFE (Working name)
- SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF INFANT LIFE (Working name)
- THE SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF INFANT LIFE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 04 January 2005 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | 04 January 2005 | 35 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH MAY 1988 AS AMENDED 28 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF BABIES DEEMED TO BE AT RISK FROM COT DEATH, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF RESPIRATION MONITORS; TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF FAMILIES OF COT DEATH VICTIMS BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window