Trustees THE CENTRAL GIFTS COMMITTEE OF THE CHURCHES OF GOD
Charity number: 299106

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Seddon | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Neil Sutton | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Woods | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Jonathan Hunter | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fergus James Reilly | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KING | Trustee | 05 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.