Trustees OXFORD YOUTH CHOIRS
Charity Number: 299109

Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Vella | Chair | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arabella Saer | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Francis Brown | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert John Legg | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jerome Gregory Finnis | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander James Stewart Silverman | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Wearden | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Chataway | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey John Sutton | Trustee | 21 June 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.