THE HIGH BEECHES GARDENS CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The historic Gardens are maintained for the enjoyment of the public, for the growth and propagation of trees and plants, for the furtherance of the study and science of botany, and for the promotion of the conservation of nature, especially those rarer species of plants and trees in danger of loss of cultivation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 April 1988: Standard registration
- H B G C T (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Robert Eastell | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Roger Bacon | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sir Philip Warner Bt | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Mark Bray | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|||||
SARAH KATHLEEN BRAY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.91k | £97.24k | £108.99k | £86.99k | £112.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.29k | £107.14k | £112.86k | £125.60k | £146.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
USE OF TRUST LAND FOR A GARDENS AND ARBORETUM FOR THE ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF RESEARCH BY THE GROWTH AND PROPAGATION OF TREES AND PLANTS WITH A VIEW TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE STUDY AND SCIENCE OF BOTANY AND THE INCREASE AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE IN RESPECT THEREOF AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE METHODS AND PRACTICE OF HORTICULTURE AND THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION OF NATURE AND ESPECIALLY THOSE RARER SPECIES OF PLANTS AND TREES IN DANGER OF LOSS TO CULTIVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
High Beeches
High Beeches Lane
Handcross
Haywards Heath
RH17 6HQ
- Phone:
- 01444400589
- Email:
- gardens@highbeeches.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window