SPACE EDUCATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Uses space as an educational tool to promote science and technology with young people. - Educates the general public regarding space. - Demonstrates that space encompasses many important fields in academia, industry, commerce and entertainment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 May 1988: Standard registration
- 09 April 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE BRITISH FOUNDATION FOR THE INTERNATIONAL SPACE UNIVERSITY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 01 September 2013 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 18 September 2012 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED 26TH OCTOBER 1988
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN AND THE PROMOTION OF ACADEMIC RESEARCH INTO SPACE RELATED STUDIES SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY AND OTHER SPACE RELATED SUBJECTS AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF SCHOLARSHIPS GRANTS ALLOWANCES AND PRIZES TO BE AWARDED TO STUDENTS ATTENDING THE INTERNATIONAL SPACE UNIVERSITY BOSTON MASSACHUSETTS USA AND ANY OTHER STUDENTS OR PERSONS ENGAGED IN RESEARCH OF ANY BRANCH OR BRANCHES OF SPACE TECHNOLOGY AND RELATED SCIENCES AND OTHER SPACE RELATED SUBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. THE PROMOTION AND AID OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE RECOGNISED BY ENGLISH LAW TO BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window