GROVE GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of garden for recreation of elderly people and accompanied children. Also for the advancement of education, arts and culture and conservation of environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 April 1988: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Allyson-Ryan FRSA | Chair | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Charlton | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Pratt | Trustee | 05 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alastair McPherson | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/04/2020 | 11/04/2021 | 11/04/2022 | 11/04/2023 | 11/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £980 | £2.55k | £6.32k | £6.32k | £3.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £925 | £2.57k | £5.50k | £3.50k | £3.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 April 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 April 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 April 2022 | 06 September 2024 | 573 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A PUBLIC GARDEN FOR THE RECREATION OF THE ADULT INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF HAYWARDS HEATH AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Area of benefit
HAYWARDS HEATH AND IT NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
76 High Street
Ardingly
Haywards Heath
RH17 6TD
- Phone:
- 07787 534749
- Email:
- nigelallysonryan@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window