CHESHAM ALL GIRLS BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a girls marching band and aim to encourage children from all walks of life to learn and enjoy marching music at the same time entertaining and giving enjoyment to others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 28 April 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA RUFF | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Victora Soler | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA BEVERLEY WELD | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARIA BEVERLY PEARSON | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LISA JOANNE CAKE | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY VICTOR SMITH MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN MICHAEL CAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN VICTORIA ANN CRAWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52k | £2.03k | £8.46k | £7.49k | £5.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.73k | £1.80k | £3.47k | £6.52k | £3.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG GIRLS BY HELPING TO TRAIN THEM IN THE PLAYING OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND EXHIBITIONS AT WHICH SUCH YOUNG GIRLS MAY PERFORM AS BANDS TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATIN OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 LOUDHAMS ROAD
AMERSHAM
HP7 9NX
- Phone:
- 01494764569
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window