GHANA SCHOOL AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ghana School Aid supports the education of children, particular girls and young women, with a focus on rural areas by making grants to schools, vocational and teacher training centres in support of local efforts, for building materials, technical equipment, teaching and learning materials, books, and School Links to enable exchange and new experiences for young people in an interconnected world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ghana
Governance
- 15 October 1992: Standard registration
- 06 January 2021: Funds received from 1164062 THE LIBRARY ACCESS PROJECT (LAP)
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD PATRICK MAYNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nigel William Dennis | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
LETITIA BOATENG | Trustee | 26 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS JO HALLETT | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr JENNIFER MACDOUGALL | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MS PENNY SEWELL | Trustee | 31 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.26k | £23.84k | £40.53k | £24.40k | £34.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.69k | £28.14k | £24.35k | £28.63k | £39.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 8 JULY 1987
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN GHANA PARTICULARLY CHILDREN ATTENDING VILLAGE SCHOOLS BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED BY THE AUTHORITIES RESPONSIBLE FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF SUCH SCHOOLS
Area of benefit
GHANA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOUNDARY HOUSE
230 Greys Road
Henley-on-Thames
RG9 1QY
- Phone:
- 01491576052
- Email:
- nigelwdennis@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window