THE SOUTH SLAV RESEARCH AND STUDY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research into Balkan history and myths and provision of information to ethnic groups to encourage the Fellowship of Slavs irrespective of cultural and religious differences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 July 1988: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92k | £2.50k | £2.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.92k | £2.45k | £2.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 04 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF THE POLITICS, RELIGION, ECONOMY AND CULTURE OF THE SOUTH SLAVS AND OTHER NATIONS OF SOUTH EAST EUROPE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUC RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window