BURNHAM ON SEA AND DISTRICT HARD OF HEARING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY BRINGS TOGETHER INDIVIDUALS WITH HEARING IMPAIRMENT. THERE ARE MONTHLY MEETINGS HELD AT BURNHAM ON SEA AND BRIDGWATER. ACTIVITIES ARE ORGANISED THROUGH THE YEAR INCLUDING DAYS OUT, ENTERTAINERS, EDUCATION AND ADVICE, PARTIES (GARDEN, CHRISTMAS, ANNIVERSARY), BINGO, QUIZZES. ANNUAL SUBSCRIPTION IS ·6.00. MONTHLY NEWSLETTER DETAILING ACTIVITIES, ASSISTANCE FOR TRANSPORT IS AVAILABLE, A C
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.32k | £869 | £306 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £1.21k | £930 | £2.48k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 22 January 2018 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 03 November 2016 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 22 February 2016 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH APRIL 1988 AS AMENDED 2 FEBRUARY 1995, 22 JULY 1996
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM IMPAIRED HEARING AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE INCLUDING:- A. TO FOSTER THE SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES OF THE HARD OF HEARING, AND PROVIDING WHEREVER POSSIBLE SELF-HELP FACILITIES. B. ENCOURAGE DEAF PEOPLE TO EQUIP THEMSELVES AS FULLY AS POSSIBLE BY MEANS OF LIP-READING, HEARING AIDS, ETC, BY MAKING KNOWN UPDATED METHODS OF TECHNOLOGY USED IN HELPING THOSE WITH A HEARING LOSS. C. BY SERVING AS AN INFORMATION CENTRE ON ALL PROBLEMS ARISING FROM DEFECTIVE HEARING.
Area of benefit
BURNHAM ON SEA AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window