WEST MOORS YOUTH CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a Youth Club facility for the young people of West Moors and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 03 May 1988: Standard registration
- WEST MOORS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pete Pickett | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Bennett | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elva Simpson | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.77k | £19.39k | £18.96k | £32.17k | £25.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.15k | £4.19k | £16.01k | £28.05k | £30.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.30k | £15.69k | £13.30k | £26.73k | £18.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 February 2021 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 22ND APRIL 1981 CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH MAY 1979 AS AMENDED 21ST MARCH 1988 AND 25 APRIL 2003 as amended on 23 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN OR NEAR THE PARISH OF WEST MOORS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES AND TO DEVELOP PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 2) THE CLUB WILL ALLOW THE USE OF ITS FACILITIES BY OTHER COMMUNITY GROUPS TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE WITHIN AND NEAR THE PARISH OF WEST MOORS.
Area of benefit
WEST MOORS
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Glenwood Road
West Moors
FERNDOWN
Dorset
BH22 0ER
- Phone:
- 07823329429
- Email:
- pete.pickett49@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window