FRIENDS OF ST MARGARET'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 299196
Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RAISE MONEY FOR THE BENEFIT OF ST MARGARETS SCHOOL AND CHURCH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £140

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • F O S M S (Working name)
  • FOSMS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KATHRYN NOBLE Trustee 14 August 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £5.20k £3.25k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.25k £5.62k £111 £116 £140
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 June 2023 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 March 2022 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 March 2022 661 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Downlands
London Road
Bowers Gifford
BASILDON
SS13 2HE
Phone:
07476795942
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available