THE VILLAGE HALL DRAYTON ST LEONARD

Charity number: 299212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of village hall space for the community in Drayton St Leonard and the surrounding area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £1,677
Total expenditure: £4,240

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Richards Trustee
THE STUART ROSSITER TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE ROYAL PHILATELIC SOCIETY, LONDON
Received: On time
DAVID HERLIHY Trustee
None on record
TERRY ROGERS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.99k £1.78k £2.18k £1.07k £1.68k
Total expenditure £751 £899 £1.51k £2.18k £4.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 06 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 31 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HEATHERCOMBE HOUSE
DRAYTON ST. LEONARD
WALLINGFORD
OX10 7BG
Phone:
01865400518
Website:

No information available