THE SHREE SITA RAM SEVA CHARITABLE TRUST (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 May 1988: Standard registration
- 05 March 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | 21 June 2006 | 203 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 21 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | 21 July 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (INCLUDING STARVATION, SICKNESS OR ANY PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR AFFLICTION) WITHOUT REGARD TO ANY RELIGIOUS DENOMINATION. (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE RELIGIOUS PURPOSES OF HINDU DHARMA AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window