THE COG-WHEEL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cogwheel is a Cambridgeshire based counselling organisation, established by Christians, that provides readily accessible support for those experiencing difficulties in their personal lives. As of 1 December 2014, the operation of Cogwheel was transferred to The Cogwheel Trust CIO, reg no 1157141. Full details available from the Annual Report to 30 November 2014 and the Charity Commission site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 09 June 1988: Standard registration
- 29 September 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 29 September 2015: Funds transferred to 1157141 Cogwheel Counselling
- COGWHEEL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 30/11/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.50k | £170.25k | £211.33k | £202.43k | £173.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.16k | £202.41k | £181.88k | £184.66k | £159.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 07 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | 07 July 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 27 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 27 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 17 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 17 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
(A) TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT TO THOSE EXPERIENCING MARITAL DIFFICULTIES, SINGLE PARENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, CHURCHES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS CONCERNING THE NATURE OF MARITAL PROBLEMS AND THE PROVISION OF AN EDUCATIONAL SERVCIE FOR MARRIAGE AND PREPARATION AND MARRIAGE MAINTENANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window