FRIENDS OF VICTORIA HOSPITAL WIMBORNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support to patients and staff at the hospital and to raise funds for equipment, resources and staff training which are not available through NHS funding.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 10 May 1988: Standard registration
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE VICTORIA HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Elizabeth Salter | Chair | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Hollingbery | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Leeder | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Saddler | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Colin M Davidson | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon E Powell | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Hart | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Charles Hardy OBE | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Munroe DICKSON | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID CHARLES POPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £442.18k | £292.92k | £1.04m | £1.45m | £404.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.24k | £73.28k | £102.96k | £363.12k | £1.77m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.24k | £3.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £973.32k | £1.38m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £53.81k | £47.94k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £10.47k | £10.37k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £3.21k | £16.23k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £961.95k | £1.37m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £101.86k | £361.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £1.10k | £1.47k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.82k | £6.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1950 AS AMENDED 20TH JUNE 1959 AND 27TH JUNE 1990 AND 24TH JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK,CONVALESCENT,DISABLED,HANDICAPPED,INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends -Victoria Hospital Wimborne
Victoria Road
Wimborne
Dorset
BH21 1ER
- Phone:
- 01202856484
- Email:
- dhc.fvhw@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window