Trustees FRIENDS OF VICTORIA HOSPITAL WIMBORNE

Charity number: 299230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anne Elizabeth Salter Chair 19 November 2019
None on record
Linda Hollingbery Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Jennifer Leeder Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Sue Saddler Trustee 17 October 2023
None on record
Dr Colin M Davidson Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
Sharon E Powell Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
Jeffery Hart Trustee 25 October 2022
None on record
Lee Charles Hardy OBE Trustee 14 July 2022
None on record
Dr David Munroe DICKSON Trustee 21 March 2014
None on record
Dr DAVID CHARLES POPE Trustee
None on record