Trustees CLEVEDON CARE

Charity Number: 299247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Ian David Turner Chair 26 April 2023
None on record
Thomas Shaw Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Brian Rose Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Marie Ann Spear Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Sarah Clark Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Kevin Casemore Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Julie Butt Trustee 07 September 2020
None on record
Diana Brown Trustee 06 February 2018
None on record