Financial history Bedford Hospital Charity and Friends

Charity Number: 299250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £241.69k £449.45k £247.63k £1.00m £1.20m
Total expenditure £164.76k £378.31k £89.82k £1.26m £1.14m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £938.62k £1.08m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £4.91k £9.43k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £58.61k £110.53k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.56k £2.41k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £712.02k £206.82k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.25m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £15.34k £25.93k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £51 £134
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £2.81k £4.01k