GOWDA SARASWATH SABHA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Arrange socio-cultural programmes to promote music, drama and fine arts - Enhance educational needs of members by organising exhibitions, meetings, lectures and seminars. - Link up and provide a medium for members to educate and communicate with fellow "Konkanis" across the globe through the charity's newsletter. - Provide educational support and aid to other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 November 1988: Standard registration
- G S SABHA (Working name)
- G S SABHA (UK) (Working name)
- GOWDA SARASWATH SABBA (UK) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SADANANDA NAYAK | Chair | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr VINOD GADIYAR | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
AARTI PAWAN NAYAK | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr SURATHKAL VASUDEVA KAMATH | Trustee | 30 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUDEEP SHENOY | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAYANARAYAN KALYA BHAT | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.33k | £979 | £943 | £3.77k | £4.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.93k | £317 | £306 | £2.62k | £1.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND BYE LAWS ADOPTED 25TH OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED 31ST OCTOBER 1987
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND CULTURE OF GOWDA SARASWATH SABHA (UK). (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. (C) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF MEMBERS OF THE GOWDA SARASWATH COMMUNITY IN THE UK BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
165 Ellerdine Road
HOUNSLOW
TW3 2PU
- Phone:
- 07723062108
- Email:
- secretary@gssuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window