PEGASUS PLAYSCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
summer playscheme includes, swimmimg,bowling,ice skating,sailing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 16 May 1988: Standard registration
- PEGASUS (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annabel Thompson | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Bladon | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Scott Thomas clark | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE JOAN MCLESTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.86k | £43.78k | £47.58k | £83.19k | £78.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.06k | £23.75k | £65.80k | £67.52k | £73.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.50k | £4.62k | £9.14k | £11.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 September 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 27 September 2024 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 10 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH MAY 1988
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES (INCLUDING HOLIDAYS) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES WHO RESIDE IN AND AROUND DOVER WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THESE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS AND WITH THE ULTIMATE AIM OF FACILITATING WHEREVER POSSIBLE THEIR MEANINGFUL SOCIAL INTEGRATION WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
THE AREA 'IN AND AROUND DOVER'
Contact information
- Address:
-
Button Cottage
Back Street
Ringwould
DEAL
Kent
CT14 8HN
- Phone:
- 07727641059
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window