Kinesiology Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote Kinesiology (as derived from Applied Kinesiology): as a preventative healthcare resource; to help reduce pain and stress; to enhance wellbeing; to optimise human potential. To provide professional training programmes for the general public and established practitioners of orthodox or complementary healthcare. To maintain a national register of professionally qualified practitioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 May 1988: Standard registration
- THE ASSOCIATION OF SYSTEMATIC KINESIOLOGY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christiane McKenzie | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Tompsett | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Belcher | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Halls | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALLISON VICTORIA PREBBLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.09k | £70.26k | £61.25k | £81.50k | £60.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.35k | £62.80k | £48.48k | £83.73k | £66.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION CONVERSION 27 JAN 2021 as amended on 15 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
To advance and provide education in the field of Kinesiology (as derived from Applied Kinesiology). To educate the public of the value of Kinesiology (as derived from Applied Kinesiology) as a complementary therapy.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o BluBooks Limited
Office 80
Bowman House
Whitehall Lane
Royal Wootton Bassett
- Phone:
- 01980881646
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window