TANGMERE MILITARY AVIATION MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a museum for the benefit of the general public and provides educational and research facilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 25 May 1988: Standard registration
- THE TANGMERE MILITARY AVIATION MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUDLEY PAUL HOOLEY | Chair | 26 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jennifer Mary Randall | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Bertram Chandler de Beer | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Smart | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Simon Davis | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Herbert | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David Michael Hatton | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Hugh Trevor | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Frederick Constable | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £363.78k | £214.90k | £292.70k | £340.16k | £405.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.08k | £168.10k | £158.00k | £273.56k | £329.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30TH MARCH 1996, 31ST MARCH, 23 APRIL 2005 AND 26TH FEBRUARY 2008. as amended on 18 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE CONSTRUCTION AND PROVISION OF A MUSEUM FOR THE PUBLIC DISPLAY OF AIRCRAFT AND AERONAUTICAL EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ITEMS RELATED TO AVIATION AND AVIATION HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TANGMERE MILITARY
AVIATION MUSEUM TRUST
GAMECOCK TERRACE
TANGMERE
CHICHESTER
WEST SUS
- Phone:
- 01243790090
- Email:
- info@tangmere-museum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window