Trustees TANGMERE MILITARY AVIATION MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 299327

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUDLEY PAUL HOOLEY | Chair | 26 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jennifer Mary Randall | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Bertram Chandler de Beer | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Smart | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Simon Davis | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Herbert | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David Michael Hatton | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Hugh Trevor | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Frederick Constable | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.