ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide informaiton, advice, counselling, referral, interpretation, translation and accompanying services on housing, welfare, health, immigration & asylum, education, training, employment to men, women, older people, young people, children, abled and disabled of all ethnic backgrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,690 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Selamawit Mengistu | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
selamawit Mengistu Miss | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meheret AddisAlem Eng. | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rahel Asfaw | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Belaye Gebre Tsadik | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Birhan Dagne | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|||||
HAMERE KASSA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.82k | £66.25k | £60.43k | £78.44k | £52.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.73k | £43.80k | £64.28k | £80.38k | £74.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.69k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | £5.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH MAY 1988 AS AMENDED 28 JUNE 1998 AND 29 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS FROM THE ETHIOPIAN AND OTHER COMMUNITIES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS FROM THE ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY AND MEMBERS OF OTHER COMMUNITIES. (III) TO PROVIDE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, PARTICULARLY FOR MEMBERS OF THE ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ethiopian Community In Britain 2a
Lithos Road
LONDON
LONDON
London
NW3 6EF
- Phone:
- 02077944265
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window