UNITED GORDON SETTER REHOMING AND SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The rehoming and general support of Gordon Setters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 May 1988: Standard registration
- GORDON SETTER REHOMING AND SUPPORT (Previous name)
- UNITED GORDON SETTER RESCUE SCHEME (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS SUSAN ANN MITCHELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Thorley | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Bage | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karin Sweryda | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Ives | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Margaret Williams | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEVEN WOODHOUSE | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SONJA JUNE UPTON-LOVETT | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAMSEY NAGATY | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|||||
MRS PAM DAVIES | Trustee | 27 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE DURNIAN CUTHBERTSON | Trustee | 07 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS REGINA FRANCES MELVILLE | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.04k | £10.53k | £6.02k | £19.71k | £8.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.70k | £4.59k | £9.11k | £11.93k | £26.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2021 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAR 1987 AS AMENDED ON 24 APR 1994 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 2008 AS AMENDED ON 05 APR 2009 as amended on 08 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST GORDON SETTERS (WHETHER OR NOT REGISTERED) IN NEED, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREGJUDICE, TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO ASSIST IN THE REHOUSING OF THEM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avonhurst
Brand Green
Redmarley
GLOUCESTER
GL19 3JD
- Phone:
- 07941422958
- Email:
- gina@avonhurst.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window