Accounts and annual returns FELTHAM VISITORS CENTRE

Charity Number: 299385
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 February 2006 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 14 February 2006 14 days late